NM SB80 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 19 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 19 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No School Discrimination For Hair
Title
No School Discrimination For Hair
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] | Sen. Brenda McKenna [D] | Sen. Shannon Pinto [D] | Sen. Harold Pope [D] |
Sen. Antoinette Sedillo Lopez [D] | Sen. Benny Shendo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 19 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:1 |
2021-03-15 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-12 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SJC |