NM SB78 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Election For Sale Of Nm-produced Liquor
Title
Election For Sale Of Nm-produced Liquor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HSEIC |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:8 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCORC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |