NM SB67 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Passed House (62-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Passed House (62-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lobbyist Reporting Changes
Title
Lobbyist Reporting Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (62-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] HSIVC |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] HSIVC and then to House Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |