NM SB664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 173 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 173 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - Educational Retirement Benefits To Spouses
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 173 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:55 N:0 |
2019-03-11 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to: SPAC/SJC |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but without recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Not Printed |