NM SB653 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Two-tiered driver's licenses
Title
Two-tiered driver's licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] HSCAC |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] HSCAC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (35-5) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Referred to Senate Finance Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |