NM SB64 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Mar. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Mar. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No Life Sentence For Juveniles
Title
No Life Sentence For Juveniles
Sponsors
Rep. Janelle Anyanonu [D] | Rep. Gail Chasey [D] | Sen. William O'Neill [D] | Rep. Kristina Ortez [D] |
Sen. Antoinette Sedillo Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Mar. 17 |
2023-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:37 N:25 |
2023-03-07 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-01 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-23 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:8 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |