NM SB622 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (63-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (63-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Multiple-trip permit for some vehicles
Title
Multiple-trip permit for some vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (63-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 49. |
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Passed Senate (25-14) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Public Affairs |