NM SB61 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 9] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 9] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Add Domestic Violence Definitions
Title
Add Domestic Violence Definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 9] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 30 |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 9] Passed House (65-0) |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Finance Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |