NM SB6 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-12 - [LD 27] LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE (Mar. 13) Ch. .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Industrial Hemp Research Rules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Hemp Research Rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-12Senate[LD 27] LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE (Mar. 13) Ch. .
2017-02-09Senate[LD 24] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Passed House (58-8)
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Floor amendment adopted
2017-01-25House[LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-22House[LD 6] HLEDC
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-21House[LD 5] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife
2017-01-21House[LD 5] Assigned to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife and then to HLEDC
2017-01-25Senate[LD 9] Passed Senate (37-2)
2017-01-25Senate[LD 9] Floor amendment adopted
2017-01-24Senate[LD 8] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2017-01-24Senate[LD 8] Referred to Senate Finance
2017-01-24Senate[LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-19Senate[LD 3] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2017-01-19Senate[LD 3] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Conservation
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback