NM SB59 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Passed House (66-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Passed House (66-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child murder as aggravating circumstance
Title
Child murder as aggravating circumstance
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Passed House (66-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-16 | [LD 23] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Passed Senate (37-2) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |