NM SB577 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance code tax, fee and other changes
Title
Insurance code tax, fee and other changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (31-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Committee substitute and then to WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |