NM SB573 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Include lead in recycled materials act
Title
Include lead in recycled materials act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] HSCAC |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |