NM SB566 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 275 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 275 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Authorization Of Tidd Bonds
Title
Legislative Authorization Of Tidd Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 275 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2019-03-13 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-03-10 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC |