NM SB554 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - [LD 47] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - [LD 47] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sale & reporting of public securities
Title
Sale & reporting of public securities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | [LD 47] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-25 | House | [LD 47] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] HWMC |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |