NM SB552 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (52-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Drinking water system financing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drinking water system financing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-20House[LD 44] Passed House (52-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.142.
2015-03-19House[LD 43] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-13House[LD 39] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2015-03-05Senate[LD 33] Passed Senate (40-0)
2015-03-05Senate[LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-02-18Senate[LD 22] Referred to Senate Finance
2015-02-18Senate[LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-27Senate[LD 6] Referred to Senate Conservation
2015-01-27Senate[LD 6] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback