NM SB55 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

No Limitation For Crimes Against Children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No Limitation For Crimes Against Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16SenateVetoed by Governor
2019-03-16SenateSenate has concurred with House Amendments
2019-03-15HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0
2019-03-15HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-15HouseReferred to: HJC
2019-03-15Housere
2019-03-15HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-08HouseHCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-27HouseSent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC
2019-02-26SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:24 N:15
2019-02-19SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-12SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-01-25SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-16SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC/SFC
2019-01-15SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback