NM SB55 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Fines For Certain Driving Violations
Title
Increase Fines For Certain Driving Violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (24-16) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |