NM SB545 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confidential substitute address act
Title
Confidential substitute address act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HGEIC |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |