NM SB54 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Schools Facilities Authority Functions
Title
Public Schools Facilities Authority Functions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:1 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |