NM SB535 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - [LD 47] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - [LD 47] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Remove sec of state oath of office filing fee
Title
Remove sec of state oath of office filing fee
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Moores [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | [LD 47] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-25 | House | [LD 47] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HGEIC |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Finance |