NM SB53 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prc Jurisdiction Over Local Exchanges
Title
Prc Jurisdiction Over Local Exchanges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 71 |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Passed Senate (31-8) |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Finance |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |