NM SB53 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State investment council membership & duties
Title
State investment council membership & duties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Passed Senate (35-0) | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=53&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0053.pdf |