NM SB526 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School district family engagement programs
Title
School district family engagement programs
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Referred to House Education |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (20-11) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs |