NM SB52 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reporting Requirements For Leda Recipients
Title
Reporting Requirements For Leda Recipients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-18 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2020-02-16 | Senate | Floor substitute adopted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SJC/SFC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |