NM SB506 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled veteran property tax exemptions
Title
Disabled veteran property tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.126. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] HGEIC |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-27 | Senate | [LD 29] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | Senate | [LD 29] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |