NM SB495 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Behavioral Health Purchasing Collaborative
Title
Behavioral Health Purchasing Collaborative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-14 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-13 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:30 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SPAC |