NM SB491 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (69-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (69-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Post-conviction dna testing act
Title
Post-conviction dna testing act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (69-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |