NM SB482 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gsd facilities director on certain committees
Title
Gsd facilities director on certain committees
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.139. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HGEIC |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Public Affairs |