NM SB480 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (62-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.138.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (62-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.138.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State purchasing expenditure codes
Title
State purchasing expenditure codes
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Passed House (62-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.138. |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Public Affairs |