NM SB471 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (61-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (61-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Brewer facility alternating proprietorship
Title
Brewer facility alternating proprietorship
Sponsors
Sen. John Sapien [D] | Rep. James Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (61-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | [LD 38] HBEC |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |