NM SB440 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (63-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.124.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (63-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.124.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small brewer & winegrower reciprocity
Title
Small brewer & winegrower reciprocity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (63-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.124. |
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HBEC |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |