NM SB44 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE (Mar. 18) Ch. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE (Mar. 18) Ch. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Project Fund Projects
Title
Water Project Fund Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE (Mar. 18) Ch. 22. |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (57-0) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-31 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |