NM SB437 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 114 - Apr. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 114 - Apr. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Raise Minimum Wage & Create Separate One
Title
Raise Minimum Wage & Create Separate One
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 114 - Apr. 1 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | House Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Sent to committee - Referrals: CC |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House failed to recede from its amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate has failed to concur in House Amendments on a Senate Bill |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:43 N:21 |
2019-03-13 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-03-12 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-09 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:27 N:15 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but without recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC |