NM SB433 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (55-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 98.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (55-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 98.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Include e-cigarettes in tobacco products act
Title
Include e-cigarettes in tobacco products act
Sponsors
Sen. John Ryan [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (55-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 98. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (29-10) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |