NM SB427 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] HSIVC
Pending: House State Government, Indian & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] HSIVC
Pending: House State Government, Indian & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expired License Info For Driving Cards
Title
Expired License Info For Driving Cards
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Ivey-Soto [D] | Sen. Howie Morales [D] | Sen. William O'Neill [D] | Sen. Gerald Ortiz Y Pino [D] |
Sen. Mimi Stewart [D] | Sen. Bill Tallman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Passed Senate (27-10) |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] fl and then to sub adptd |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |