NM SB425 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 49 - Mar. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

County Detention Facility Treatment Programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Detention Facility Treatment Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 49 - Mar. 30
2023-03-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
2023-03-10HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2023-03-07HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
2023-03-06SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:36 N:3
2023-03-06Senatemultiple floor amendments
2023-03-03SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2023-02-28SenateSHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2023-02-13SenateSent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback