NM SB425 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 186 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 186 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dept. Of Defense Satellite Gross Receipts
Title
Dept. Of Defense Satellite Gross Receipts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 186 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2019-03-13 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-09 | House | Sent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:33 N:5 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC |