NM SB406 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:50 N:15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medical Marijuana Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:50 N:15
2019-03-11HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-08HouseSent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC
2019-03-07SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:33 N:2
2019-03-07Senatemultiple floor amendments
2019-03-02SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-27SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-01-29SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback