NM SB401 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fed Mining Revenue To State Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fed Mining Revenue To State Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateVetoed by Governor
2019-03-11HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
2019-03-10HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-04HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
2019-03-01SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0
2019-02-27SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-21SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-29SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback