NM SB4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redistricting Precinct Boundaries
Title
Redistricting Precinct Boundaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-22 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC |