NM SB395 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - [LD 14] Passed House (66-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - [LD 14] Passed House (66-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rename Alcohol & Gaming Division
Title
Rename Alcohol & Gaming Division
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Griggs [R] | Sen. Cliff Pirtle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (66-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to HSIVC |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |