NM SB391 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 185 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 185 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
High School G.e.d. External Diploma
Title
High School G.e.d. External Diploma
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 185 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:54 N:9 |
2019-03-08 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-27 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HSEIC |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |