NM SB386 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevent double taxing of certain gas
Title
Prevent double taxing of certain gas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Passed House (59-0) |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] HWMC |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HEENC |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HEENC and then to HWMC |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |