NM SB383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 99 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 99 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Game Commission Fair Chase Rulemaking
Title
Game Commission Fair Chase Rulemaking
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 99 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2019-03-12 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |