NM SB38 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife Trafficking Act
Title
Wildlife Trafficking Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-14 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-08 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HJC |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:15 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |