NM SB378 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Beef Council Assessment Opt-out
Title
Beef Council Assessment Opt-out
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (65-0) |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Passed Senate (37-1) |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |