NM SB361 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limit Use Of Oil & Gas Fund For Salaries

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limit Use Of Oil & Gas Fund For Salaries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-03HouseHENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-27HouseSent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HAFC
2019-02-25SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:39 N:1
2019-02-22SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-19SenateSCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-25SenateSent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback