NM SB358 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - [LD 50] Passed House (56-1) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - [LD 50] Passed House (56-1) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Halfway house & transitional facility act
Title
Halfway house & transitional facility act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | [LD 50] Passed House (56-1) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Passed Senate (40-1) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |