NM SB339 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco Cessation Coverage For Medicaid
Title
Tobacco Cessation Coverage For Medicaid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-14 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-13 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC |