NM SB333 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-08 | Senate | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Committee substitute and then to WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Not Printed |